WebJan 3, 2014 · Maj Gen Graham Binns, who is the chief executive of Aegis Defence Services, commanded the 7th Armoured Brigade when it led the siege of Basra in 2003. … http://news.bbc.co.uk/2/hi/uk_news/6982108.stm
Westminster Group appoints Maj Gen (Ret.) Graham Binns to its …
WebHe became Assistant Chief of Defence Staff (International Security Policy) in March 2009 and Assistant Chief of Defence Staff (Global Issues) in January 2011. [1] His responsibilities include Chemical Biological Radiological & Nuclear Policy, Arms Control and Counter Proliferation and Cyber. [1] WebBritish Army Maj. Gen. Graham Binns and his senior staff briefed Mullen and his party. The admiral broke off from his USO Holiday Tour to speak with the British leaders at Basra International Airport. citibank affordable housing
Britain
WebOct 10, 2013 · President of KBR UK and a former British army officer. Major General Graham Binns CBE, DSO, MC Former British army officer, now CEO of Aegis Defence … Major General Graham John Binns, CBE, DSO, MC is a retired British Army officer. Binns served as General Officer Commanding 1st (UK) Armoured Division and then Commandant Joint Services Command and Staff College. He had previously commanded the 7th Armoured Brigade (the "Desert Rats") during … See more Graham Binns was educated at Hymers College in Hull. See more Binns was commissioned on 11 December 1976, into the General list. He was transferred to The Prince of Wales's Own Regiment of Yorkshire on 2 July 1977. He was promoted to See more Binns is married to Jennie. They have four children: Sophie (born September 1985), Thomas (born May 1988), Rosemary (born March 1990) and … See more In June 2010, Binns became chief executive of Aegis Defence Services, a private military and security company. In 2011 Binns was appointed to the honorary position of See more WebMay 12, 2003 · Graham Binns, arts and broadcasting administrator and campaigner: born Barking, Essex 13 June 1925; married 1950 Jillian Palmer (died 2003; two sons); died Cleveley, Oxfordshire 12 May 2003.... dianin hp filter